Richard fearon
WebbRichard E. Fearon, Jr. founded Accretive Capital Partners in 2000, a private investment fund targeting undervalued small and micro-cap stocks of fundamentally strong public … Webb28 mars 2024 · March 28, 2024 - 8:00 am. MILFORD, Mass. Waters™ Corporation (NYSE:WAT) today announced the appointment of Richard Fearon to its Board of Directors, effective March 27, 2024. Mr. Fearon is the former Vice Chairman and Chief Financial and Planning Officer of Eaton Corporation, a multinational power management company. …
Richard fearon
Did you know?
Webb17 feb. 2024 · Richard H. Fearon has served as Chief Financial and Planning Officer of Eaton since April 2002 and Vice Chairman since January 2009. He is responsible for the accounting, control, corporate development, information systems, internal audit, investor relations, strategic planning, tax and treasury functions of Eaton. Webb10 dec. 2024 · By Guy Woodford. CRH has added two non-executive directors to the group's board. Sixty-four-year-old Fearon is currently the vice chairman and chief financial and planning officer of Eaton Corporation plc, a global power management company, roles he has held since 2009 and 2002, respectively. The US national has responsibility and …
WebbRichard Fearon Non-executive Director Acquisitions, Divestments & Finance Committee; Audit Committee*; Safety, Environment & Social Responsibility Committee See more Johan Karlström Non-executive Director Acquisitions, Divestments & Finance Committee; Remuneration Committee; Safety, Environment & Social Responsibility Committee See … Webb1 apr. 2024 · Richard H. Fearon has served as Chief Financial and Planning Officer of Eaton since April 2002 and Vice Chairman since January 2009. He is responsible for the accounting, control, corporate development, information systems, internal audit, investor relations, strategic planning, tax and treasury functions of Eaton.
Webb28 mars 2024 · Waters™ Corporation (NYSE:WAT) today announced the appointment of Richard Fearon to its Board of Directors, effective March 27, 2024. Mr. Fearon is the former Vice Chairman and Chief Financial ... WebbRichard H. Fearon. Lead Director of our Board since May 14, 2015. Retired Chief Financial and Planning Officer and Vice Chairman of Eaton, a global manufacturing company. Mr. …
Webb12 dec. 2016 · Richard Fearon Owner, Accretive Capital Partners, LLC Madison, Connecticut, United States 761 followers 500+ connections …
WebbRichard James Fearon Obituary. It is with deep sorrow that we announce the death of Richard James Fearon of Owensboro, Kentucky, born in Flint, Michigan, who passed away on February 27, 2024, at the age of 74, leaving to mourn family and friends. hubcap productionsWebbRichard H. Fearon is vice chairman and chief financial and planning officer, and a member of the board of directors, of Eaton, a global power management company. In this role, he … hubcap peripheral agentWebb28 mars 2024 · Mar 28, 2024 08:00 am. MILFORD, Mass. --. Waters™ Corporation (NYSE:WAT) today announced the appointment of Richard Fearon to its Board of Directors, effective March 27, 2024. Mr. Fearon is the former Vice Chairman and Chief Financial and Planning Officer of Eaton Corporation, a multinational power management company. hog switchWebbCorebridge (Pty) Ltd. Jan 2002 - Present21 years 4 months. Cape Town South Africa. New Venture establishment, bootstrap, co creation and … hogs wild rc planeWebbRichard Fearon London, England, United Kingdom 4K followers 500+ connections Join to follow Articles by Richard Why paying fair tax helps … hub cap part number 151485Webb23 juni 2024 · Pre-pandemic, the rail strikes would have taken more of a toll on Leeds Building Society, but boss Richard Fearon says a 30% reduction in the number of people in the office went "seamlessly". hubcap promotionsWebbMr. Richard H. Fearon is an Independent Non-Executive Director at CRH Plc, an Independent Director at Crown Holdings, Inc., an Independent Director at Avient Corp., a … hogswatch movie